OK HB2929 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-27 - coauthored by Sparks
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Labor; discriminatory wages; prohibiting certain actions by employer; increasing penalties; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor; discriminatory wages; prohibiting certain actions by employer; increasing penalties; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-26 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 58 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-27Senatecoauthored by Sparks
2016-05-27Senatecoauthored by Munson
2016-05-26SenateCCR read
2016-05-26HouseTo Senate
2016-05-26HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 26
2016-05-26HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Proctor, Inman
2016-05-26HouseCCR adopted
2016-05-09HouseEnacting clause restored
2016-05-09HouseTitle restored
2016-05-09HouseCCR submitted
2016-04-27SenateConference granted, SCs named Loveless, Newberry, David, Griffin, Dahm, Floyd, Bass
2016-04-25HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
2016-04-21HouseSA's received
2016-04-21SenateEngrossed to House
2016-04-20SenateReferred for engrossment
2016-04-20SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 8
2016-04-20SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2016-04-18Senatecoauthored by McDaniel (Randy)
2016-04-18Senatecoauthored by Osborn
2016-04-14Senatecoauthored by Henke
2016-04-12Senatecoauthored by Matthews
2016-04-12Senatecoauthored by Pittman
2016-04-07SenateEnacting clause stricken
2016-04-07SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2016-03-28Senatecoauthored by Floyd
2016-03-22Senatecoauthored by Griffin
2016-03-21SenateSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2016-03-21Senatecoauthored by David
2016-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2016-03-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2016-03-10HouseReferred for engrossment
2016-03-10HouseMotion expired
2016-03-08HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Dunnington
2016-03-08HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 32
2016-03-08HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Lockhart, Wood, Sherrer, Scott, Shelton, Hoskin
2016-03-08HouseGeneral Order
2016-02-18HouseTitle stricken
2016-02-18HouseAuthored by Senator Loveless (principal Senate author)
2016-02-18HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Young, Griffith, Virgin
2016-02-18HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2016-02-09HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee sub-committee
2016-02-02HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee
2016-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2016-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Dunnington
2016-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
401981New CodeSee Bill Text
401982New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2929&Session=1600
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/hB/HB2929%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2929%20SUBREC.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2929%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/HB2929%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/hB/HB2929%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/HB2929%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2929%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB2929%20CCS.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB2929_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB2929_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback