OK HB2922 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Debtor and creditor; creating the Oklahoma Student Borrower's Bill of Rights Act; prohibiting certain actions by student loan servicers; effective date.
Title
Debtor and creditor; creating the Oklahoma Student Borrower's Bill of Rights Act; prohibiting certain actions by student loan servicers; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Melissa Provenzano [D] | Sen. John Montgomery [R] | Rep. Carol Bush [R] | Rep. Kelly Albright [D] |
Rep. Denise Brewer [D] | Rep. John Waldron [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2020-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 8 |
2020-03-09 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-09 | House | Amended |
2020-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bush, Brewer |
2020-03-09 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron, Albright |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Provenzano |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |