OK HB2918 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms; clarifying manner in which loaded and unloaded firearms may be carried without a license; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; clarifying manner in which loaded and unloaded firearms may be carried without a license; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2018-03-19Senatecoauthored by Roberts (Sean)
2018-03-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-15HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 16
2018-03-14HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Ritze, Moore, Gann, Downing
2018-03-14HouseGeneral Order
2018-03-01HouseAuthored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author)
2018-03-01HouseCR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Public Safety
2018-02-19HouseWithdrawn from Judiciary Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Coody
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2112896New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback