OK HB2913 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Industrial hemp; creating the Oklahoma Industrial Hemp Agricultural Pilot Program; codification; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Industrial hemp; creating the Oklahoma Industrial Hemp Agricultural Pilot Program; codification; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23HouseApproved by Governor 04/23/2018
2018-04-17HouseSent to Governor
2018-04-17SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2018-04-17HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2018-04-16HouseReferred for enrollment
2018-04-16SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2018-04-16SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 1
2018-04-16SenateAmendment restored bill to engrossed version
2018-04-16SenateEmergency clause restored
2018-04-16SenateTitle restored
2018-04-16SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2018-04-09Senatecoauthored by Lowe
2018-04-04SenateEmergency clause stricken
2018-04-04SenateTitle stricken
2018-04-04SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2018-03-27SenateReferred to Appropriations
2018-03-27SenateReported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2018-03-20SenateSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2018-03-06SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-06HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-05HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-05HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
2018-03-05HouseEmergency added
2018-03-05HouseAmended
2018-03-05HouseHouse Rule suspended
2018-03-05HouseAuthored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author)
2018-03-05HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Rosecrants
2018-03-05HouseGeneral Order
2018-02-06HouseCR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Dollens, Echols
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
23402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
23403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
23404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
23405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
23406Amended CodeSee Bill Text
23407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
23408Amended CodeSee Bill Text
23409Amended CodeSee Bill Text
23410Amended CodeSee Bill Text
632101New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2913&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB2913%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB2913%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB2913%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB2913%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/hB/HB2913%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB2913_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2913_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2913_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback