OK HB2913 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; providing a sales tax exemption for construction projects; providing penalty; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; providing a sales tax exemption for construction projects; providing penalty; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. David Brumbaugh [R] | Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] |
Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Revenue and Tax Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Revenue and Tax Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2014-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Ritze, Hoskin |
2014-03-10 | House | General Order |
2014-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Shaw (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Brumbaugh |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |