OK HB2912 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; requiring students to receive instruction in the use of an automated external defibrillator; effective date.
Title
Schools; requiring students to receive instruction in the use of an automated external defibrillator; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Education: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Education: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-28 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Virgin | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |