OK HB2911 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Workers' compensation; prohibiting creation of new business entity to avoid certain judgments. Emergency.
Title
Workers' compensation; prohibiting creation of new business entity to avoid certain judgments. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - House - House: (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2010 | |
2010-05-06 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-06 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-06 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-05 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-05 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-05 | SA's read, adopted | |
2010-04-12 | SA's received | |
2010-04-12 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-08 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-08 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2010-04-08 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-03-17 | coauthored by Walker | |
2010-03-17 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-16 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-09 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Walker | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-03-04 | First Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-03 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-03 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | Authored by Senator Coates (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Morgan | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |