OK HB2906 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - coauthored by Shelton
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - coauthored by Shelton
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Mental health; creating the Vulnerable Adult Intervention Team Pilot Program. Emergency.
Title
Mental health; creating the Vulnerable Adult Intervention Team Pilot Program. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Rep. Ken Luttrell [R] | Sen. Judy McIntyre [D] | Rep. Danny Morgan [D] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Rep. Paul Roan [D] | Rep. Mike Shelton [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | coauthored by Shelton | |
2010-04-06 | Title stricken | |
2010-04-06 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-04-05 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-24 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee | |
2010-03-22 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services | |
2010-03-16 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Shelton | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading | |
2010-03-08 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-04 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 8 | |
2010-03-04 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Luttrell, Roan, Hoskin | |
2010-03-04 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-25 | Authored by Senator Eason McIntyre (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-25 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Morgan | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43A | 10 | 104 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 10 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |