OK HB2887 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - CR; Do Pass Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - CR; Do Pass Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Children; modifying placement preference requirements; effective date.
Title
Children; modifying placement preference requirements; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-13 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | CR; Do Pass Human Services Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Human Services | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Pittman | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |