OK HB2883 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; relating to the Oklahoma Vehicle License and Registration Act; defining powersports vehicle and powersports vehicle dealer. Effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; relating to the Oklahoma Vehicle License and Registration Act; defining powersports vehicle and powersports vehicle dealer. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-19 - House - House: (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/06/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-26 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-26 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-25 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-25 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-19 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-19 | To Senate | |
2010-05-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-19 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-13 | Title restored | |
2010-05-13 | CCR submitted | |
2010-04-27 | HC's named: Luttrell, Hoskin, Glenn, Christian, Armes, McNiel, Kirby | |
2010-04-19 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-15 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-06 | SA's received | |
2010-04-06 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-05 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-24 | coauthored by Pittman | |
2010-03-24 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-24 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-09 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Pittman | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading | |
2010-02-17 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-16 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1 | |
2010-02-16 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin | |
2010-02-16 | General Order | |
2010-02-11 | Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-11 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Luttrell | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |