OK HB2882 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Law enforcement training; authorizing certain schools and institutions of education to offer courses and training for law enforcement certification upon approval of CLEET; codification; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law enforcement training; authorizing certain schools and institutions of education to offer courses and training for law enforcement certification upon approval of CLEET; codification; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03HouseApproved by Governor 05/08/2018
2018-05-02HouseSent to Governor
2018-05-02SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2018-05-02HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2018-05-01HouseReferred for enrollment
2018-05-01HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
2018-05-01HouseSA's read, adopted
2018-04-27HouseSA's received
2018-04-27SenateEngrossed to House
2018-04-26SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-04-26SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 1
2018-04-26SenateTitle restored
2018-04-26SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2018-04-11SenateTitle stricken
2018-04-11SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2018-04-05SenateReferred to Appropriations
2018-04-05SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety committee; CR filed
2018-03-20SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2018-02-28SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-28HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-02-27HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-02-27HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 14
2018-02-27HouseAuthored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author)
2018-02-27HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Loring, Cockroft, Ritze, Murphey, Roberts (Sean)
2018-02-27HouseGeneral Order
2018-02-15HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Kerbs, McDugle
2018-02-15HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative West (Josh)
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
70331116Amended CodeSee Bill Text
70331117Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2882&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB2882%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2882%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB2882%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB2882%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB2882%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB2882%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2882%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/hB/HB2882%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB2882_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2882_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2882_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback