OK HB2882 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Roads, bridges and ferries; designating various memorial highways. Effective date.
Title
Roads, bridges and ferries; designating various memorial highways. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Constance Johnson [D] | Rep. Ryan Kiesel [D] | Rep. Ken Luttrell [R] | Sen. Judy McIntyre [D] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Sen. Joe Sweeden [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - House - House: (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2010 | |
2010-05-06 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-06 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-06 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-05 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 9 | |
2010-05-05 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kiesel | |
2010-05-05 | SA's read, adopted | |
2010-04-26 | SA's received | |
2010-04-26 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-21 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-21 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-04-05 | coauthored by Pittman | |
2010-04-05 | coauthored by Eason McIntyre, Johnson (Constance) | |
2010-04-05 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-31 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-16 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Pittman | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2010-02-25 | First Reading | |
2010-02-25 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-24 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-24 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 5 | |
2010-02-24 | Amended | |
2010-02-24 | General Order | |
2010-02-11 | Authored by Senator Sweeden (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-11 | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Luttrell | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
69 | 1698 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 74 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 75 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 76 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |