OK HB2856 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Physical therapy; requiring State Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision to promulgate certain rules; effective date.
Title
Physical therapy; requiring State Board of Medical Licensure and Supervision to promulgate certain rules; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2016-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 14 |
2016-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2016-03-07 | House | General Order |
2016-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Sean) |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |