OK HB2846 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Public health and safety; creating the Oklahoma Kratom Consumer Protection Act; requiring kratom vendors to disclose certain information on product label; codification; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; creating the Oklahoma Kratom Consumer Protection Act; requiring kratom vendors to disclose certain information on product label; codification; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2020-03-03SenateFirst Reading
2020-03-03HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-03-02HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-03-02HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
2020-03-02HouseAmended
2020-03-02HouseAuthored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author)
2020-03-02HouseGeneral Order
2020-02-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Echols
2020-02-11HouseCR; Do Pass Rules Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Pae
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback