OK HB2841 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife
Pending: Senate Tourism and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife
Pending: Senate Tourism and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Game and fish; authorizing the Wildlife Conservation Commission to establish certain passports; effective date.
Title
Game and fish; authorizing the Wildlife Conservation Commission to establish certain passports; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House: Agriculture and Wildlife Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife |
2014-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-05 | House | General Order |
2014-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |