OK HB2835 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/13/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public health and safety; deleting age limitation for certain definitions; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; deleting age limitation for certain definitions; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-05 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 69 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-16HouseApproved by Governor 05/13/2016
2016-05-09HouseSent to Governor
2016-05-09SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2016-05-09HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2016-05-05HouseReferred for enrollment
2016-05-05HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 14
2016-05-05HouseSA's read, adopted
2016-04-20HouseSA's received
2016-04-20SenateEngrossed to House
2016-04-19SenateReferred for engrossment
2016-04-19SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2016-04-19SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2016-04-07Senatecoauthored by Derby
2016-04-04SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2016-03-16SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2016-03-08SenateFirst Reading
2016-03-08HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2016-03-07HouseReferred for engrossment
2016-03-07HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 6
2016-03-07HouseAmended
2016-03-07HouseAuthored by Senator Yen (principal Senate author)
2016-03-07HouseGeneral Order
2016-02-09HouseCR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
2016-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
2016-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Echols
2016-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
632101New CodeSee Bill Text
632801New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2835&Session=1600
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/hB/HB2835%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/HB2835%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/hB/HB2835%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB2835%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/HB2835%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB2835%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/hB/HB2835%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB2835_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB2835_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback