OK HB2832 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Ayes: 48 Nays: 45
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Ayes: 48 Nays: 45
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; directing the Oklahoma Tax Commission to issue a separate exemption card to certain persons authorized to make purchases on behalf of an eligible veteran; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; directing the Oklahoma Tax Commission to issue a separate exemption card to certain persons authorized to make purchases on behalf of an eligible veteran; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Rob Standridge [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] |
Rep. Ken Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Ayes: 48 Nays: 45 |
2014-05-05 | House | Motion to override veto tabled |
2014-04-29 | House | Vetoed 04/29/2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2014-03-11 | Senate | coauthored by Walker |
2014-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin |
2014-03-10 | House | General Order |
2014-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Martin (Scott) |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |