OK HB2820 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Professions and occupations; creating the Music Therapy Practice Act; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professions and occupations; creating the Music Therapy Practice Act; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-26HouseApproved by Governor 04/26/2016
2016-04-21HouseSent to Governor
2016-04-21SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2016-04-21HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2016-04-19HouseReferred for enrollment
2016-04-19SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2016-04-19SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7
2016-04-19SenateAmendment restored bill to engrossed version
2016-04-19SenateEnacting clause restored
2016-04-19SenateTitle restored
2016-04-19SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2016-04-18Senatecoauthored by Matthews
2016-04-11Senatecoauthored by Pittman
2016-04-04SenateEnacting clause stricken
2016-04-04SenateTitle stricken
2016-04-04SenateReported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2016-03-16SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2016-03-08SenateFirst Reading
2016-03-08HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2016-03-07HouseReferred for engrossment
2016-03-07HouseRemove Senator Halligan as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Bice
2016-03-07HouseMotion expired
2016-03-02HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Denney
2016-03-02HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 42
2016-03-02HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Russ, Wright
2016-03-02HouseGeneral Order
2016-02-25HouseAuthored by Senator Halligan (principal Senate author)
2016-02-25HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2016-02-16HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
2016-02-02HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
2016-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2016-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Denney
2016-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5919211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
59192110Amended CodeSee Bill Text
59192111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5919212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5919213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5919214Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5919215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5919216Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5919217Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5919218Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5919219Amended CodeSee Bill Text
598891Amended CodeSee Bill Text
598892Amended CodeSee Bill Text
598893Amended CodeSee Bill Text
598894Amended CodeSee Bill Text
598895Amended CodeSee Bill Text
598896Amended CodeSee Bill Text
598897Amended CodeSee Bill Text
598898Amended CodeSee Bill Text
598899Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2820&Session=1600
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/hB/HB2820%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2820%20SUBREC.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2820%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/HB2820%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/hB/HB2820%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/HB2820%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/hB/HB2820%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB2820_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB2820_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback