OK HB2779 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2779
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Becomes law without Governor's signature 05/27/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Becomes law without Governor's signature 05/27/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency room capacity; making an appropriation to the University Hospital Authority; source and amount; referencing actions of the Joint Committee on Pandemic Relief Funding.
Title
Emergency room capacity; making an appropriation to the University Hospital Authority; source and amount; referencing actions of the Joint Committee on Pandemic Relief Funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 73 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: Utilities Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: Utilities Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Becomes law without Governor's signature 05/27/2022 |
2022-05-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3 |
2022-05-20 | Senate | 2 CCR adopted |
2022-05-20 | Senate | 2 CCR read |
2022-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2022-05-20 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 4 |
2022-05-20 | House | 2 CCR adopted |
2022-05-18 | House | 2 CCR submitted |
2022-05-18 | Senate | SCs changed Leewright, Allen, Rader, Jech, Boren, Hicks to Thompson, McCortney, Treat, Hall, Floyd |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Further conference granted |
2022-05-18 | House | CCR rejected, further conference requested, naming Special Conference Committee on ARPA |
2022-05-18 | House | Remove Senator Leewright as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Thompson |
2021-05-18 | House | Title restored |
2021-05-18 | House | CCR submitted |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Leewright, Allen, Rader, Jech, Boren, Hicks |
2021-04-29 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Utilities |
2021-04-26 | House | SA's received |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2021-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 6 |
2021-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-11 | House | Considered |
2021-03-10 | House | Laid over |
2021-03-10 | House | Title stricken |
2021-03-10 | House | Amended |
2021-03-10 | House | General Order |
2021-02-23 | House | CR; Do Pass Utilities Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Utilities |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Pfeiffer |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2779 (Carry Over) 2021-05-18 - Title restored