OK HB2751 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-22 - Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary
Pending: Senate Appropriations Public Safety and Judiciary Sub Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-22 - Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary
Pending: Senate Appropriations Public Safety and Judiciary Sub Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
DNA evidence; requiring persons arrested for certain crimes to submit to deoxyribonucleic acid DNA testing. Effective date.
Title
DNA evidence; requiring persons arrested for certain crimes to submit to deoxyribonucleic acid DNA testing. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Jeannie McDaniel [D] |
Rep. Paul Roan [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 23 | |
2010-03-08 | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-08 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan, McDaniel (Jeannie) | |
2010-03-08 | General Order | |
2010-02-16 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Billy | |
2010-02-16 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Denney | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 991a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 150 | 27a | New Code | See Bill Text |