OK HB2746 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 06/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Amusements and sports; defining terms; updating terminology to reflect modification of definitions. Effective date.
Title
Amusements and sports; defining terms; updating terminology to reflect modification of definitions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Childers [R] | Sen. Constance Johnson [D] | Rep. Charles Joyner [R] | Rep. Dan Kirby [R] |
Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] | Rep. Skye McNiel [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-25 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 50 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House: Conference Committee on Insurance: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 50 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House: Conference Committee on Insurance: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Approved by Governor 06/08/2012 | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-25 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-25 | coauthored by Childers, Johnson (Constance) | |
2012-05-25 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-24 | CCR read | |
2012-05-24 | To Senate | |
2012-05-24 | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0; Ayes: 50 Nays: 23 | |
2012-05-24 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-22 | Title restored | |
2012-05-22 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-18 | SCs named Marlatt, Jolley, Childers, Treat, Ivester, Sparks | |
2012-05-18 | Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference | |
2012-05-07 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2012-05-03 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Insurance and Economic Development | |
2012-04-30 | SA's received | |
2012-04-30 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-25 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-25 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-09 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-04-02 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2012-04-02 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-03-01 | First Reading | |
2012-03-01 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-02-29 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-29 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 8 | |
2012-02-29 | Amended | |
2012-02-29 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman | |
2012-02-29 | General Order | |
2012-02-09 | Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-09 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Joyner, McNiel | |
2012-02-09 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Kirby | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3A | 604 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3A | 604 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |