OK HB2746 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public safety; modifying list of offenses subject to revocation of driving privileges. Effective date.
Title
Public safety; modifying list of offenses subject to revocation of driving privileges. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Sen. Jim Halligan [R] | Rep. Ryan Kiesel [D] |
Rep. Paul Roan [D] | Rep. Mike Shelton [D] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - House - House: (Y: 74 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary & Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary & Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-05 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-05 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-04 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 8 | |
2010-05-04 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cox | |
2010-05-04 | SA's read, adopted | |
2010-04-08 | SA's received | |
2010-04-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-07 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-07 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-24 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-10 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 1 | |
2010-03-10 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-03-10 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan, Kiesel, Shelton, Tibbs | |
2010-03-10 | General Order | |
2010-02-23 | Authored by Senator Halligan (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Denney | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 6 | 205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 6 | 212 | New Code | See Bill Text |