OK HB2721 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; providing ambulance attendant and driver requirements; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; providing ambulance attendant and driver requirements; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Sen. Darcy Jech [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 58 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 32 |
2018-03-15 | House | Title stricken |
2018-03-15 | House | Amended |
2018-03-15 | House | Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-15 | House | General Order |
2018-02-06 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Russ |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |