OK HB2713 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Counties and county officers; Court Clerk's Revolving Fund; transferring duties; effective date.
Title
Counties and county officers; Court Clerk's Revolving Fund; transferring duties; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | Approved by Governor 04/16/2012 | |
2012-04-10 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-10 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-10 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-09 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-09 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-09 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-09 | coauthored by Garrison | |
2012-04-09 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-29 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-07 | First Reading | |
2012-03-07 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-06 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-06 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Condit | |
2012-03-06 | General Order | |
2012-03-01 | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-01 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Jackson | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |