OK HB2701 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Game and fish; relating to the definition of resident for licensing purposes; modifying definition; relating to hunting licenses; deleting exemptions for certain military personnel. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Game and fish; relating to the definition of resident for licensing purposes; modifying definition; relating to hunting licenses; deleting exemptions for certain military personnel. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-28 Died in conference
2010-05-04 HC's named: McDaniel (Randy), Richardson, Pruett, Smithson, Renegar, Sears, DeWitt, Jordan
2010-05-03 Conference granted, SCs named Lamb, Schulz, Marlatt, Justice, Gumm
2010-04-21 SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
2010-04-15 SA's received
2010-04-15 Engrossed to House
2010-04-14 Referred for engrossment
2010-04-14 Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2010-04-14 coauthored by Gumm, Corn
2010-04-14 General Order, Amended
2010-03-29 Enacting clause stricken
2010-03-29 Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2010-03-25 Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; pending CR
2010-03-15 Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife
2010-03-10 First Reading
2010-03-10 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2010-03-09 Referred for engrossment
2010-03-09 Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1
2010-03-09 Title stricken
2010-03-09 Amended
2010-03-09 Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin
2010-03-09 General Order
2010-02-24 Emergency added
2010-02-24 Authored by Senator Lamb (principal Senate author)
2010-02-24 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Wildlife Committee
2010-02-02 Second Reading referred to Wildlife
2010-02-01 Authored by Representative McDaniel (Randy)
2010-02-01 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
292138New CodeSee Bill Text
294110New CodeSee Bill Text
294112New CodeSee Bill Text
294113New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback