OK HB2676 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; establishing the Oklahoma Bridge to Literacy Program; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; establishing the Oklahoma Bridge to Literacy Program; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Constance Johnson [D] | Sen. Judy McIntyre [D] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Rep. Seneca Scott [D] |
Rep. Mike Shelton [D] | Sen. Jabar Shumate [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-24 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 71 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - House - House: Conference Committee on Education: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 71 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - House - House: Conference Committee on Education: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Approved by Governor 05/30/2012 | |
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-24 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-24 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-24 | coauthored by Scott | |
2012-05-24 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2012-05-24 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2012-05-24 | To Senate | |
2012-05-24 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Shelton | |
2012-05-24 | Motion to reconsider tabled | |
2012-05-22 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 13 | |
2012-05-22 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Reynolds | |
2012-05-22 | Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 13 | |
2012-05-22 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-18 | Title restored | |
2012-05-18 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-07 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2012-05-02 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Education | |
2012-04-30 | SA's received | |
2012-04-30 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-25 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-25 | coauthored by Pittman | |
2012-04-25 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2012-04-25 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-26 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2012-03-26 | Title stricken | |
2012-03-26 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-03-15 | First Reading | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-14 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-14 | Authored by Senator Eason McIntyre (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-14 | General Order | |
2012-03-01 | Emergency added | |
2012-03-01 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Shumate | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1 | 107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 516 | New Code | See Bill Text |