OK HB2666 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Public health and safety; adding substances to Schedules I, II and IV; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; adding substances to Schedules I, II and IV; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: Public Health committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-28HouseApproved by Governor 04/25/2014
2014-04-21HouseSent to Governor
2014-04-21SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2014-04-17HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2014-04-16HouseReferred for enrollment
2014-04-16SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2014-04-16SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
2014-04-16SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2014-03-31SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2014-03-13SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2014-03-03SenateFirst Reading
2014-03-03HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2014-02-27HouseReferred for engrossment
2014-02-27HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0
2014-02-27HouseAmended
2014-02-27HouseAuthored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author)
2014-02-27HouseGeneral Order
2014-02-13HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Bennett
2014-02-13HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
2014-02-05HouseReferred to Public Health Committee
2014-02-05HouseWithdrawn from Judiciary Committee
2014-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2014-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Derby
2014-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
632101New CodeSee Bill Text
632204New CodeSee Bill Text
632206New CodeSee Bill Text
632210New CodeSee Bill Text
632312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
632503New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback