OK HB2659 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Professions and occupations; Oklahoma Uniform Building Code Commission Act; providing for late fee; requiring semiannual report; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professions and occupations; Oklahoma Uniform Building Code Commission Act; providing for late fee; requiring semiannual report; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-18 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - Senate: MOTION (Y: 26 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-25 Approved by Governor 05/30/2012
2012-05-23 Sent to Governor
2012-05-23 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2012-05-23 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2012-05-22 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-22 Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2012-05-22 CCR adopted
2012-05-18 CCR read
2012-05-18 To Senate
2012-05-18 Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
2012-05-18 CCR adopted
2012-05-16 Title restored
2012-05-16 CCR submitted
2012-05-02 Conference granted, SCs named Newberry, Treat, Brinkley, Stanislawski, Burrage, Eason McIntyre
2012-04-30 SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
2012-04-24 SA's received
2012-04-24 Engrossed to House
2012-04-23 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-23 Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
2012-04-23 General Order, Considered
2012-04-02 Title stricken
2012-04-02 Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2012-03-08 Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2012-03-06 First Reading
2012-03-06 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-03-05 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-05 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 4
2012-03-05 Amended
2012-03-05 General Order
2012-02-23 Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author)
2012-02-23 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2012-02-06 Authored by Representative Jordan
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
59100023New CodeSee Bill Text
59100025New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback