OK HB2648 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Officers; Oklahoma Religious Freedom Act; free exercise; place of worship; substantial burden; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Officers; Oklahoma Religious Freedom Act; free exercise; place of worship; substantial burden; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: States Rights Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2021-03-15SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2021-03-04SenateCoauthored by Representative McBride
2021-03-04SenateCoauthored by Representative Boatman
2021-03-04SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-04HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-03HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-03HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 18
2021-03-03HouseAuthored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
2021-03-03HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Steagall, CrosswhiteHader, West (Kevin), Cornwell, Caldwell (Chad), Kendrix, Dills, Grego, Boles, Conley, Gann, Mize, Stark, Russ, Roberts (Eric), Roberts (Sean), McDugle, Caldwell (Trey), Bashore, Wolfley, Moore, West (Tammy), Miller, Smith, Dempsey, Baker, Lepak, McCall, Sims, Lawson, Williams, Roe, Humphrey, ODonnell, Phillips, Manger
2021-03-03HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-03HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Echols, Hardin (David), Townley, Burns
2021-02-03HouseRemove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative Hill
2021-02-03HouseCR; Do Pass States Rights Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to States Rights
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Echols
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2648&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB2648%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB2648%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB2648%20HFLR%20-%20COPY.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB2648%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB2648%20SFLR.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2648%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB2648%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2648_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2648_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback