OK HB2646 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2646
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical marijuana; clarifying duties of the Oklahoma Medical Marijuana Authority; codification; effective date.
Title
Medical marijuana; clarifying duties of the Oklahoma Medical Marijuana Authority; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. Zack Taylor [R] | Rep. Dean Davis [R] | Sen. Cody Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: AMENDMENT (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: AMENDMENT (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | House | Approved by Governor 05/28/2021 |
2021-05-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-05-26 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-05-25 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2021-05-24 | Senate | CCR read |
2021-05-24 | House | To Senate |
2021-05-24 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 3 |
2021-05-24 | House | CCR adopted |
2021-05-19 | House | CCR submitted |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Taylor, Leewright, Paxton, McCortney, Pugh, Brooks |
2021-04-29 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2021-04-26 | House | SA's received |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2021-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rogers |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-09 | House | Amended |
2021-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis |
2021-03-09 | House | General Order |
2021-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2646 (Carry Over) 2021-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2021