OK HB2646 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

State government; relating to the State Use Committee; modifying members and definitions; providing for temporary exception for hte purchase of certain products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government; relating to the State Use Committee; modifying members and definitions; providing for temporary exception for hte purchase of certain products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - House - House: Conference Committee on Government Modernization: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-25 Approved by Governor 05/25/2012
2012-05-24 Sent to Governor
2012-05-24 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2012-05-24 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2012-05-23 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-23 Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0
2012-05-23 CCR adopted
2012-05-21 CCR read
2012-05-21 To Senate
2012-05-21 Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 12
2012-05-21 CCR adopted
2012-05-17 Title restored
2012-05-17 CCR submitted
2012-05-03 Conference granted, SCs named Holt, Aldridge, Griffin, Brinkley, Bass, McAffrey
2012-04-24 SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Government Modernization and Rules
2012-04-19 SA's received
2012-04-19 Engrossed to House
2012-04-18 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-18 Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 2
2012-04-18 Title stricken
2012-04-18 General Order, Amended
2012-04-18 Backed up to General Order
2012-04-18 Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2
2012-04-12 Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Holt
2012-04-12 Measure failed: Ayes: 21 Nays: 18
2012-04-12 General Order, Considered
2012-03-28 coauthored by Hickman
2012-03-28 Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
2012-03-15 Second Reading referred to General Government
2012-03-08 First Reading
2012-03-08 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-03-07 Referred for engrossment
2012-03-07 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 22
2012-03-07 Authored by Senator Holt (principal Senate author)
2012-03-07 Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern
2012-03-07 General Order
2012-03-05 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Government Modernization
2012-02-06 Authored by Representative Brumbaugh
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback