OK HB2646 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-22 - Referred to Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation
Pending: Senate Appropriations General Government and Transportation Sub Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-22 - Referred to Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation
Pending: Senate Appropriations General Government and Transportation Sub Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Transportation; modify provisions related to construction or improvement of municipal roads; providing for agreements. Emergency.
Title
Transportation; modify provisions related to construction or improvement of municipal roads; providing for agreements. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Referred to Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-03-10 | First Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-09 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-09 | Amended | |
2010-03-09 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Jeannie) | |
2010-03-09 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Jordan | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 36 | 113 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 339 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 603 | New Code | See Bill Text |