OK HB2644 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; requiring the State Department of Education to certify compliance with certain laws prior to allocating State Aid payments; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; requiring the State Department of Education to certify compliance with certain laws prior to allocating State Aid payments; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-03-07 | First Reading | |
2012-03-07 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-06 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 2 | |
2012-03-06 | General Order | |
2012-02-29 | Emergency added | |
2012-02-29 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-29 | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-29 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Blackwell | |
2012-02-29 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Brumbaugh | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |