OK HB2641 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; providing for reduction of state tax credits; federal credit. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; providing for reduction of state tax credits; federal credit. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-09 - House - House: AM (Y: 45 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-28 Died in conference
2010-04-28 Conference granted, GCCA
2010-04-26 SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
2010-04-20 SA's received
2010-04-20 Engrossed to House
2010-04-19 Referred for engrossment
2010-04-19 Motion expired
2010-04-13 Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Stanislawski
2010-04-13 Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 17
2010-04-13 Senate Rule suspended
2010-04-13 General Order, Amended
2010-03-24 coauthored by Ivester
2010-03-24 Enacting clause stricken
2010-03-24 Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2010-03-23 Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Ivester
2010-03-23 Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; pending CR
2010-03-15 Second Reading referred to Finance
2010-03-10 First Reading
2010-03-10 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2010-03-09 Referred for engrossment
2010-03-09 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 12
2010-03-09 Amended by floor substitute
2010-03-09 Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author)
2010-03-09 General Order
2010-02-25 Title stricken
2010-02-25 CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
2010-02-02 Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2010-02-01 Authored by Representative Martin (Steve)
2010-02-01 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
682356AAmended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback