OK HB2637 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2637
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Securities; crowdfunding; portals; exemptions; procedures; effective date.
Title
Securities; crowdfunding; portals; exemptions; procedures; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. Julie Daniels [R] | Rep. Brian Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from Business and Commerce committee |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-11 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-11 | House | Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill |
2020-03-11 | House | General Order |
2019-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2637 (Carry Over) 2019-02-20 - CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee