OK HB2621 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; specifying rate for certain travel costs for which bail bondsmen bear; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; specifying rate for certain travel costs for which bail bondsmen bear; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | CCR read |
2018-05-03 | House | To Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 |
2018-05-03 | House | CCR adopted |
2018-05-02 | House | Title restored |
2018-05-02 | House | CCR submitted |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Leewright, Bergstrom, Daniels, Bice, Kidd, Brooks, Pittman |
2018-04-25 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Insurance |
2018-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 7 |
2018-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-12 | House | General Order |
2018-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative West (Kevin) |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |