OK HB2596 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2596
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - Authored by Senator Stephens (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-22 - Authored by Senator Stephens (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Tourism and Recreation Department; park ranger jurisdiction; effective date.
Title
Tourism and Recreation Department; park ranger jurisdiction; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Stephens (principal Senate author) |
2023-02-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey |
2023-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2023-02-14 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2023-02-13 | House | Remove Representative Humphrey as principal House author and substitute with Representative Hays |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Humphrey |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2596 (Carry Over) 2023-02-22 - Authored by Senator Stephens (principal Senate author)