OK HB2595 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; granting courts authority to consider post-traumatic stress disorder as mitigating factor when sentencing veterans; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; granting courts authority to consider post-traumatic stress disorder as mitigating factor when sentencing veterans; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Morrissette [D] | Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. John Bennett [R] |
Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Sen. Corey Brooks [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Sen. J.J. Dossett [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2016 |
2016-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-04-19 | Senate | coauthored by Dossett |
2016-04-19 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2016-04-05 | Senate | coauthored by Roberts (Dustin) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2016-03-29 | Senate | coauthored by Brooks |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2016-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2016-03-02 | House | Amended |
2016-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer |
2016-03-02 | House | General Order |
2016-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Morrissette, Bennett |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |