OK HB2591 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2591
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid; creating the Defunding Statutory Rape Cover-up Act; effective date.
Title
Medicaid; creating the Defunding Statutory Rape Cover-up Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Rep. Mike Sanders [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] |
Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Charles McCall [R] | Rep. Lonnie Sims [R] | Rep. Mark Lawson [R] |
Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by Governor 04/30/2019 |
2019-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-25 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on General Order |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McCall |
2019-02-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 20 |
2019-02-11 | House | Authored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sanders, Russ, Lawson, Sims |
2019-02-11 | House | General Order |
2019-02-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean) |
2019-02-05 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2591 (Carry Over) 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019