OK HB2573 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Game and fish; requiring suspension and revocation of hunting or fishing license upon poaching conviction; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Game and fish; requiring suspension and revocation of hunting or fishing license upon poaching conviction; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-01 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-08 Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
2012-05-02 Sent to Governor
2012-05-02 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2012-05-02 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2012-05-01 Referred for enrollment
2012-05-01 Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1
2012-05-01 SA's read, adopted
2012-04-11 SA's received
2012-04-11 Engrossed to House
2012-04-10 Referred for engrossment
2012-04-10 Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0
2012-04-10 General Order, Amended
2012-03-29 Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed
2012-03-08 Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife
2012-02-21 First Reading
2012-02-21 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2012-02-20 Referred for engrossment
2012-02-20 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 33
2012-02-20 Coauthored by Representative(s) Vaughan
2012-02-20 General Order
2012-02-15 Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
2012-02-15 CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee
2012-02-07 Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment
2012-02-06 Authored by Representative Ownbey
2012-02-06 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
295202New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback