OK HB2573 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Counties and county officers; relating to basic salary increases for county officers; relating to medical care costs for persons in custody; directing hospitals to accept payment pursuant to certain fee schedule. Effective date.
Title
Counties and county officers; relating to basic salary increases for county officers; relating to medical care costs for persons in custody; directing hospitals to accept payment pursuant to certain fee schedule. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Coffee [R] | Rep. Rex Duncan [R] | Sen. Jay Gumm [D] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Rep. Glen Smithson [D] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] | Rep. John Trebilcock [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-27 - House - House: (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary & Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary & Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/07/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-28 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-28 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-28 | 2 CCR read | |
2010-05-27 | To Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 3 | |
2010-05-27 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-21 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2010-05-19 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2010-05-18 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2010-05-12 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-12 | Title restored | |
2010-05-12 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-03 | HC's named: Trebilcock, Tibbs, Duncan, Smithson, Roan | |
2010-05-03 | Conference granted, SCs named Coffee, Jolley, Crain, Burrage, Gumm | |
2010-04-22 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-20 | SA's received | |
2010-04-20 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-19 | coauthored by Gumm | |
2010-04-19 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-30 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-30 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to Health and Human Services | |
2010-03-16 | Withdrawn from General Government committee | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2010-03-10 | First Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-09 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 10 | |
2010-03-09 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-09 | Amended | |
2010-03-09 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Smithson, Tibbs, Duncan | |
2010-03-09 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | Authored by Senator Coffee (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-25 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Trebilcock | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 180 | 63 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 180 | 75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 746 | New Code | See Bill Text |