OK HB2557 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-15 - CR; Do Pass State and Federal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-15 - CR; Do Pass State and Federal Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Daylight saving time; exempting Oklahoma from federal daylight saving time provision; effective date.
Title
Daylight saving time; exempting Oklahoma from federal daylight saving time provision; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - House - House: State and Federal Relations Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass State and Federal Relations Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to State and Federal Relations |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Wright |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |