OK HB2547 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repealer; telemedicine informed consent; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealer; telemedicine informed consent; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-25HouseApproved by Governor 04/25/2016
2016-04-19HouseSent to Governor
2016-04-19SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2016-04-19HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2016-04-18HouseReferred for enrollment
2016-04-18SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2016-04-18SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2016-04-18SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2016-04-11Senatecoauthored by Pittman
2016-03-28SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2016-03-10SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2016-03-07Senatecoauthored by Scott
2016-02-24SenateFirst Reading
2016-02-24HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2016-02-23HouseReferred for engrossment
2016-02-23HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
2016-02-23HouseGeneral Order
2016-02-10HouseAuthored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
2016-02-10HouseCR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
2016-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2016-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Mulready
2016-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback