OK HB2539 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; required markings on state vehicles; exemption; Office of Juvenile Affairs; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; required markings on state vehicles; exemption; Office of Juvenile Affairs; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25HouseApproved by Governor 04/25/2018
2018-04-19HouseSent to Governor
2018-04-19SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2018-04-19HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2018-04-18HouseReferred for enrollment
2018-04-18SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2018-04-18SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2018-04-18SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2018-03-29SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2018-03-20SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2018-03-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-07HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-06HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-06HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 15
2018-03-06HouseAuthored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
2018-03-06HouseGeneral Order
2018-02-15HouseCR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Munson
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2539&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB2539%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB2539%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB2539%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB2539%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/hB/HB2539%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB2539_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2539_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2539_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback