OK HB2530 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Domestic violence; modifying training requirement to include certain education; effective date.
Title
Domestic violence; modifying training requirement to include certain education; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Judiciary Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 21 |
2014-03-05 | House | Amended |
2014-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman |
2014-03-05 | House | General Order |
2014-02-19 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Floyd |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |