OK HB2523 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Game and fish; creating a one-day nonresident fishing license; emergency.
Title
Game and fish; creating a one-day nonresident fishing license; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-15 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 58 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 58 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Died in conference | |
2012-05-22 | SCs named GCCA | |
2012-05-22 | SCs removed Bass, Brown, Coates, Ellis, Fields, Treat | |
2012-05-22 | Further conference granted | |
2012-05-21 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2012-05-16 | Emergency added | |
2012-05-16 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-10 | Conference granted, SCs named Coates, Ellis, Bass, Brown, Fields, Treat | |
2012-04-26 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA | |
2012-04-10 | SA's received | |
2012-04-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-09 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-09 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-29 | Reported Do Pass as amended Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading | |
2012-03-08 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-07 | Motion expired | |
2012-03-05 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Martin (Steve) | |
2012-03-05 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 26; Ayes: 58 Nays: 33 | |
2012-03-05 | General Order | |
2012-02-28 | Authored by Senator Coates (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-28 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Martin (Steve) | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |