OK HB2521 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Coauthored by Senator Bullard
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; creating the Oklahoma Educator Loan Repayment Program; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; creating the Oklahoma Educator Loan Repayment Program; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2019-04-09SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-09SenateReported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-03-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-11HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-07HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2
2019-03-07HouseAuthored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author)
2019-03-07HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Ranson
2019-03-07HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-19HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano
2019-02-19HouseCR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative West (Tammy)
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback