OK HB2521 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Torts; charitable clinic under the Volunteer Professional Services Immunity Act; effective date.
Title
Torts; charitable clinic under the Volunteer Professional Services Immunity Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Approved by Governor 04/17/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-11 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-11 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-10 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-10 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-10 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-10 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-29 | coauthored by Peterson | |
2012-03-29 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-13 | First Reading | |
2012-03-13 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-12 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-12 | General Order | |
2012-02-15 | Authored by Senator Paddack (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-15 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Kern | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |