OK HB2519 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; relating to tax credits for coal incentives; modifying reference to taxable years. Effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; relating to tax credits for coal incentives; modifying reference to taxable years. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Cannaday [D] | Sen. Mike Johnson [R] | Rep. Tad Jones [R] | Rep. Scott Martin [R] |
Rep. Ken Miller [R] | Sen. David Myers [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-28 - House - House: (Y: 75 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - House - House: PREV QUESTION (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - House - House: PREV QUESTION (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/07/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-28 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-28 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-28 | CCR read | |
2010-05-28 | To Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 20 | |
2010-05-28 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cannaday | |
2010-05-28 | Remove Representative Miller as principal House author and substitute with Representative Jones | |
2010-05-28 | Ayes: 67 Nays: 8 | |
2010-05-28 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-28 | Emergency removed | |
2010-05-28 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-28 | Title restored | |
2010-05-28 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-28 | SCs named Coffee, Mazzei, Laster, Lamb | |
2010-05-28 | Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference | |
2010-05-28 | Withdrawn from GCCA; HC's named: Jones, Thomsen, Brannon | |
2010-05-06 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-15 | SA's rejected, conference requested, GCCA | |
2010-04-08 | SA's received | |
2010-04-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-07 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 | |
2010-04-07 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-04-07 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-02-09 | Direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-08 | First Reading | |
2010-02-08 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-04 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 15 | |
2010-02-04 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-04 | Amended | |
2010-02-04 | General Order | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading, direct to Calendar | |
2010-02-01 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Myers | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Johnson (Mike) (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Miller, Martin (Scott) | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |