OK HB2516 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/12/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/12/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public retirement systems; Public Employees Retirement System; unused sick leave; employer payments; reference; effective date.
Title
Public retirement systems; Public Employees Retirement System; unused sick leave; employer payments; reference; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Approved by Governor 04/12/2018 |
2018-04-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-06 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-05 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2018-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-05 | House | General Order |
2018-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2018-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking and Business Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking and Business |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative McDaniel |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |